Day(s)
As of: 6/5/2024 2:20:15 AM
Created: 3/6/2021 1:20 PM
8:30 AM to 10:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sens Elfreth and Guzzone
State Finance and Procurement - Appropriation Reductions (Board of Public Works Budget Reduction Clarification Act)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Patterson
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Chr B&T (Dept)
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sens Bailey and Guzzone
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officer - Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Elfreth (AA Co Admin)
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Edwards
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification for Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Members - Active Status Points
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Elfreth (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Wicomico County Senators
Wicomico County - Property Tax Credit - Hotel or Residential Development
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Benson
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
(Added - 3/8/2021 1:34 PM)
Sen Peters
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sen Guzzone
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations and Degree and Credential Programs - Alterations
(Added - 3/3/2021 9:35 AM)
Sen McCray
Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sens Corderman and Edwards
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sens Zucker and Griffith
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
(Removed - 3/1/2021 4:53 PM)
Sen Hester (Jt Cybscty Info BioTech Comm)
Department of Information Technology - Status of Information Technology and Cybersecurity in State and Local Agencies
(Removed - 3/8/2021 2:36 PM)
(Added - 1/8/2021 12:10 PM)
Capital Salisbury University
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Capital University of Baltimore
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Created: 2/12/2021 2:20 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Lee
Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sen Rosapepe
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sens Hester and Rosapepe
Education – Technology Resources – Funding (Ending the Digital Divide Act)
Sen Hester
Department of Legislative Services - Study - Capacity and Accountability of State Department of Education
Sen Lam
County Boards of Education - Accessibility Standards - Digital Tools (Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for Grades K-12 Education)
Sen Pinsky
Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
(Added - 3/3/2021 12:15 PM)
Sens Zucker and Guzzone
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption - Public School Employees
Sen Klausmeier (Chr Wkrs' Cmp Bnft & Ins)
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sen Klausmeier (Chr Wkr's Cmp Bnft & Ins)
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sen Benson
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Created: 2/9/2021 5:11 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Benson
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
(Added - 3/2/2021 5:16 PM)
Created: 3/8/2021 4:48 PM
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sponsor hearings of bills for rereferrals.
Created: 2/21/2021 12:33 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Del Rosenberg
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
(Added - 2/25/2021 7:26 PM)
(Added - 2/25/2021 7:26 PM)
(Added - 1/8/2021 12:10 PM)
Capital Salisbury University
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Capital University of Baltimore
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
(Removed - 1/19/2021 12:22 PM)
Created: 2/9/2021 11:24 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 2/9/2021 11:25 AM)
(Added - 2/9/2021 11:25 AM)
(Removed - 2/18/2021 7:16 PM)
Created: 2/23/2021 12:48 PM
5:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/4/2021 3:50 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/5/2021 9:22 AM
12:30 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/11/2021 11:06 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del K. Young
Maryland Department of Health – Gene Synthesis Providers and Manufacturers of Gene Synthesis Equipment – Certification
Del Lisanti
Hospitals and Freestanding Medical Facilities - Closing or Partial Closing - Public Notice
Del Hill
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Judiciary)
Created: 3/8/2021 9:32 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 601 and HB 910
Created: 3/8/2021 9:31 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Or immediately following the floor session.
-HB 463, 611, 643, 849, 1148, 1243, and 1280
Created: 2/10/2021 10:11 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills are ordered as they appear below. Each bill sponsor will be receive three (3) minutes to provide oral testimony while each witness will receive two (2) minutes to provide oral testimony.
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Health and Government Operations)
Del Feldmark
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2021)
Del Kipke
Office of the Attorney General - Violent Crimes Special Prosecution Unit for Baltimore City
Del Mangione
Crimes – Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
(Removed - 2/27/2021 9:13 AM)
Created: 3/8/2021 3:17 PM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This vote session will now begin at 8:00pm*
Del Wells
Real Property - Alterations in Actions for Repossession and Establishment of Eviction Diversion Program
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Environment and Transportation)
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Environment and Transportation)
Created: 3/7/2021 12:39 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This Subcommittee will begin at 4:30pm*
- HBs 93, 646, 893
Del Amprey
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Real Property Assessments and Appeals
Del Mangione
Property Tax Exemption - Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Refund
Bill hearings on local bills for the 2021 session will be sponsor only.
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Economic Matters)
Del Hornberger
Business Personal Property Tax – Businesses Affected by COVID–19 Restrictions – Reimbursement
Bill hearings on local bills will be sponsor only for the 2021 session.
(Added - 2/23/2021 6:03 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 9:12 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 9:12 PM)
(Added - 2/10/2021 9:12 PM)
Del Arentz
Election Law - Voter Registration List - Right to Nondisclosure of Personal Information
(Added - 2/10/2021 9:12 PM)
Del Parrott
Election Law – Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
Del Palakovich Carr
State Board of Elections – Membership, Contract Management, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Voting System Financing
(Added - 2/10/2021 9:12 PM)
Del Kaiser
Mail-In Voting - Certification of Assistance, Design of Materials, and Ballot Curing
(Added - 2/23/2021 6:03 PM)
(Added - 2/23/2021 6:03 PM)
Del Wilkins
Campaign Finance - Contribution Through Third-Party Payment Processor - Transfer to Campaign Account
(Added - 2/23/2021 6:03 PM)
(Added - 2/23/2021 6:03 PM)
HB 370 will be discussion only. (Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Health and Government Operations)
HB 377 will be discussion only.
HB 401 will be discussion only.
Del Luedtke
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Removed - 3/8/2021 7:27 PM)