Day(s)
As of: 9/20/2024 10:43:38 AM
Created: 4/7/2021 12:17 PM
12:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/7/2021 10:15 AM
10:16 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/7/2021 1:15 PM
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Wilson
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Kaiser
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Del Stewart
Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Del Lierman
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Washington
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Washington
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Prohibition on Retaliation for Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work
Sen Hayes
Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 4/5/2021 9:18 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bill hearing will begin at 5:45 PM.
Del Kelly
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Sponsor Only
Sponsor hearings of bills for rereferrals
Sen Jennings
State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification
Created: 4/6/2021 8:33 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/6/2021 6:46 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept), et al
Arts and Entertainment Districts – Artistic Work and Arts and Entertainment Enterprise – Definitions
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Sen Patterson
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Sens Corderman and Edwards
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Sen Jackson
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Sen Guzzone
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 - Appropriations and Degree and Credential Programs - Alterations
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:13 PM)
Created: 4/6/2021 8:27 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Hershey, et al
Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Created: 4/6/2021 4:23 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/7/2021 4:14 PM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/7/2021 11:51 AM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Rosapepe
State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Washington
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Applied Behavior Analysis Services – Reimbursement
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Sydnor
Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Duties of the Special Secretary - Minority Business Enterprises
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Children's Vaccines - Study and Temporary Authority
(Added - 4/7/2021 4:48 PM)
Created: 4/5/2021 5:40 PM
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 353, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Added - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)
- SB 106, SB 326, SB 360, SB 649, SB 689 and SB 697
(Removed - 4/6/2021 9:47 AM)
Created: 4/7/2021 5:29 PM
5:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/7/2021 1:01 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
This Voting Session will begin at 6:30 pm.
Sen Feldman
Economic Development - Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sen Edwards
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Sen Augustine, et al
Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Inclusion Fund – Establishment
Sens Hester and Bailey
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
Sen Ferguson
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax and Tobacco Tax - Alterations and Implementation
(Added - 4/7/2021 2:47 PM)
Sen Hester
Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
Created: 4/6/2021 3:02 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
NOTE: Voting Session will begin immediately after the second House Floor Session.
Created: 4/6/2021 4:22 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
NOTE: Voting Session will begin immediately after the Election Law Sub-committee meeting, approximately 5:15 pm.
Sen Feldman
Economic Development - Comprehensive Technical Assistance Program - Establishment
Sen Edwards
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Donations to Diaper Banks and Other Charitable Entities
Sen Augustine, et al
Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Inclusion Fund – Establishment
(Added - 4/7/2021 8:31 AM)
Sens Hester and Bailey
Income Tax Credit for Venison Donation - Alterations, Extension, and Testing for Chronic Wasting Disease
(Added - 4/6/2021 5:07 PM)
Sen Ferguson
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax and Tobacco Tax - Alterations and Implementation
Sen Hester
Economic and Community Development - Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
Created: 3/4/2021 11:53 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
The meeting will be conducted via webinar. To view click here
General Meeting
Created: 3/30/2021 11:08 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Open Meeting of Full Authority + Closed Executive Session