Day(s)
As of: 3/28/2024 4:51:35 PM
Created: 4/8/2021 12:05 PM
1:30 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:15 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/6/2021 12:42 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Bills hearings will be Sponsor only.
Created: 4/8/2021 1:59 PM
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Sample-Hughes
Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Del Lierman
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Dels Stein and Lierman
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Del Bhandari
State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Temporary Licenses to Practice Physical Therapy and Limited Physical Therapy
Del Valentino-Smith
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Del Krebs
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Del Charkoudian
Maryland Recycling Act - Recyclable Materials and Resource Recovery Facilities - Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Long
Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
Del Kipke
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Al Co Deleg and Gar Co Deleg
Allegany County and Garrett County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Del Krimm
Office of Legislative Audits – Acceptance and Investigation of Allegations of Fraud, Waste, and Abuse
Del Krebs
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Del Harrison
Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - Bowie State
Del R. Lewis
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Del Rosenberg
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
Del Shetty
Pharmacists - Required Notification and Authorized Substitution - Lower-Cost Drug or Device Product
Del Lierman, et al
Department of Housing and Community Development - Office of Statewide Broadband - Established (Digital Connectivity Act of 2021)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Belcastro
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech–Language Pathologists – Duties, Appointment of Members, and Requirements for Licensees
Howard County Delegation
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Del Washington
Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Prohibition on Retaliation for Not Returning to In-Person Instruction and Work
Sen Sydnor
Legislative Department - Eligibility to Serve as Senators and Delegates - Place of Abode
Sen Zucker
Maryland Transit Administration – Conversion to Zero–Emission Buses (Zero–Emission Bus Transition Act)
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Created: 4/7/2021 5:57 PM
9:15 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del D. Barnes
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Del Feldmark
Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
Del Kelly
Health Information Exchanges - Electronic Health Information - Sharing and Disclosure
Created: 4/8/2021 1:04 PM
2:15 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Wilson
Nursing Homes – Resident Change in Condition – Notification and Consultation With Physician
Created: 4/7/2021 10:44 AM
9:30 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
9:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sponsor hearings of bills for rereferrals
Created: 4/8/2021 1:29 PM
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Del Bridges
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Sen Hayes
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Sen Patterson
Environment - Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund - Funding, Reallocation, Reimbursements, and Study
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Del Valentino-Smith (Chr Jt Cmte End Hom)
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Sen Washington (Ch Jt Comm End Hmlnss)
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
(Added - 4/8/2021 3:16 PM)
Created: 4/8/2021 9:19 AM
3:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:45 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/8/2021 12:47 PM
3:20 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/8/2021 11:30 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Or one hour after the floor session concludes.
Sen Augustine
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Chr FIN (Dept)
Licensing – Good Standing With the State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Requirement
Sen Carter, et al
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training (Healing Maryland's Trauma Act)
Sen Eckardt
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
Created: 4/7/2021 10:20 AM
11:00 AM
-
Zoom / YouTube
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- HB 1032 and SB 82
Created: 4/6/2021 8:22 PM
Wednesday, April 7, 2021
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
- SB 67, SB 299, SB 565, SB 777 and SB 796
(Added - 4/7/2021 5:55 PM)
- SB 67, SB 299, SB 777
(Removed - 4/7/2021 5:55 PM)
Created: 4/7/2021 12:18 PM
9:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/8/2021 12:46 PM
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The time of this Voting Session may change depending on the duration of today’s House floor session.
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Sen Kelley, et al
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Sen Patterson
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 4/8/2021 12:53 PM)
Sen Lam
Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
Created: 4/7/2021 8:25 AM
12:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Kagan
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Telehealth
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:06 PM)
Sen Kelley, et al
Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
Sen Lam
Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Ways and Means)
(Added - 4/7/2021 3:06 PM)
Sen Patterson
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Partnership Pilot Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.