Day(s)
As of: 3/23/2023 8:24:54 AM
Created: 3/7/2023 11:53 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Dels Korman and Szeliga
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Evaluation, Termination of Bond Authority, and Assumption of Functions, Employees, and Contracts (Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority Sunset Act)
(Added - 3/20/2023 10:20 AM)
Created: 3/22/2023 8:19 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/20/2023 3:10 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bills are sponsor only.
Del Queen
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
Del Guyton
Division of Rehabilitation Services and Developmental Disabilities Administration - Memorandum of Understanding
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Education, Energy, and the Environment)
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
Del Atterbeary
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability - Review of State Workforce Development Programs
Del Kipke, et al
Maryland Department of Health and Maryland Health Care Commission - Dental Services - Survey and Regional Needs Assessment
(Added - 3/21/2023 11:13 AM)
Del Queen
Commercial Law and Financial Institutions - Credit Regulation - Shared Appreciation Agreements
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
Del Cullison, et al
State Board of Dental Examiners - University of Maryland School of Dentistry Faculty - Qualifying for Examination
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
Dels Bagnall and Rosenberg
Maryland Insurance Commissioner Enforcement - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Sunset Extension
(Added - 3/21/2023 10:47 AM)
Created: 3/16/2023 6:21 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
All bills hearings are sponsor only except for HB 159.
Del Taylor, et al
Real Property - Land Installment Contracts - Requirements and Vendor Duties and Limitations
Del Holmes
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations – Funding of Reserve Accounts
Del R. Lewis
Residential Property - Affordable Housing Land Trusts - Authority to Establish Condominium Regimes
(Added - 3/20/2023 6:55 PM)
(Added - 3/20/2023 6:55 PM)
Created: 3/20/2023 4:12 PM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Sen Feldman, et al
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions – Reproductive Health Services Plans – Requirements
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Health and Government Operations)
Sen Zucker, et al
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund - Annual Appropriation and Authorized Uses
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Sen King, et al
Higher Education - Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Altering Name of Scholarship
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Prince George's County Senators
Prince George's County - Prince George's County Reentry Employment Incentive Program - Funding
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Sen Jackson
State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Sen Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
State Retirement and Pension System - Earnable Compensation, Nonvested Former Members, and Immediate Vesting
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Sen Jackson, et al
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership - Emergency Medical Technicians
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Sen Jackson (Chr Jt Com on Pnsns)
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Transfer of Membership - Modifications
The bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.
Created: 3/20/2023 3:57 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Chr JPR (Dept)
Motor Vehicles - Commercial Driver's Licenses and Instructional Permits - Revisions
Chr, Educ, Energy, and Env Committee
Voluntary Cleanup Program - Determination and Recordation Deadlines
Sen Mautz
Talbot County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Intersection of Maryland Route 333 (Oxford Road) and Bonfield Avenue
(Removed - 3/21/2023 11:37 AM)
Canceled
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee - Work Session
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/19/2023 9:11 PM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/14/2023 2:03 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Special Witness Guidelines
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted.
All bills are sponsor only, unless otherwise noted.
Sen Beidle, et al
Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
Sen M. Washington
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License and Registration Issuance and Renewals - Electronic Means
Sen Augustine
Health Occupations – Clinical and Graduate Alcohol and Drug Counselors – Licensure
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/18/2023 1:04 PM)
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/18/2023 3:12 PM)
Chr FIN (Dept)
State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Sunset Extension
One witness to speak in favor of the bill, one witness opposed, and the bill sponsor.
(Added - 3/18/2023 3:12 PM)
Created: 3/17/2023 4:24 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sen Beidle, et al
Maryland State Police Gun Center - Firearms Surrendered Under Final Protective Orders
Sen Bailey
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Prior Convictions
Created: 3/22/2023 3:22 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
1:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
The Spkr (Atty Gen Ofc)
Human Relations - Civil Rights Enforcement - Powers of the Attorney General
Created: 3/6/2023 10:08 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kagan
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program - Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account - Funding
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
Sen Guzzone, et al
Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Redevelopment Areas in Baltimore County - Sunset Extension
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit - Technical Correction
Sen Guzzone (Offc of the Cmptrllr), et al
Income Tax - Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit - Alterations
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
Sens Hayes and Guzzone
Economic Development – Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program – Alterations and Financing
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony
(Added - 3/10/2023 9:37 AM)
Del Feldmark, et al
Tax - Fees for Electronic Filing of Tax Documents - Prohibition (Free Filing Act of 2023)
(Removed - 3/10/2023 9:37 AM)
Harford County Delegation Meeting
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland Meeting
Criminal Procedure
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Police
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Public Safety
Alcoholic Beverages
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Gaming
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
The Law Enforcement Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Courts