Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/20/2022 1:23:04 PM
Thursday, January 20, 2022
Thursday, January 20, 2022
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: January 20, 2022 12:13 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0001
Sen Beidle, et al

State Finance and Procurement – Prevailing Wage – Stop Work Orders
SB0048
Sen Kramer

Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
SB0144
Sen Feldman

Health - Authorization to Prescribe and Administer Amygdalin - Repeal
SB0224
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Labor and Employment - Employment Standards and Conditions - Definition of Employer
SB0255
Sen Beidle, et al

State Personnel Management System – Office of the Public Defender – Placement and Collective Bargaining
SB0259
Sen Feldman, et al

Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
SB0275
Sens Hayes and Benson

Labor and Employment – Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program – Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2022)

Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 20, 2022 11:32 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
January 25, 2022 3:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: January 21, 2022 1:00 PM)
(Previous Date/Time: January 21, 2022 8:30 AM)
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Change made: January 20, 2022 11:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 8, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0106
Sen Washington

Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Grant Funding - Violence Prevention and Community Service
SB0286
Sen Hough

Firearms – Use of Medical Cannabis
SB0298
Sen Young, et al

Criminal Law - Threat Against Public Health Official or Hospital Staff Member
SB0300
Sens Hough and Young

Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior

Change made: January 20, 2022 11:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0279
Sen Hettleman

Access to Counsel in Evictions Special Fund - Alteration
SB0280
Sen Hettleman

Interim and Temporary Protective Orders - Electronic Filing and Video Conferencing Hearings

Change made: January 20, 2022 11:55 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0287
Sen Hough

Correctional Services - Division of Parole and Probation - Definition of Absconding

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 20, 2022 9:32 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
January 25, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0054
Del Crosby

Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment
REMOVED: 9:32 AM

Change made: January 20, 2022 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 1, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0054
Del Crosby

Higher Education – St. Mary’s College of Maryland – Cost–of–Living Adjustment

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 20, 2022 10:17 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 26, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0274
Del Qi, et al

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website
REMOVED: 10:17 AM

Change made: January 20, 2022 10:20 AM - HEARING ADDED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0274
Del Qi, et al

Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Prices Listed on Dealer Website

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 20, 2022 9:39 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0089
Del Queen

Child Care Stabilization Grant Program and Child Care Expansion Grant Program - Established
HB0146
Dels Moon and Atterbeary

Education – Reportable Offenses and Student Discipline – Alterations
HB0226
Dels Guyton and Luedtke

Public Schools – Self–Contained Special Education Classroom – Use of Video Recording Devices
HB0240
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Board of Education – Membership MC 16–22
HB0243
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Board of Education – Student Member Scholarship MC 05–22
HB0261
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Prohibiting a Ban or Regulation of Sale of Coffee
HB0277
Del Patterson, et al

Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment

Other
No. 4 - Baltimore County
Change made: January 20, 2022 8:45 AM - HEARING CANCELED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 20, 2022 3:30 PM to January 20, 2022 4:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Change made: January 20, 2022 11:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
No. 4 - Baltimore County - Other
January 27, 2022 4:00 PM to January 27, 2022 5:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore County Public School discussion with Superintendent Darryl Williams.

Click to return on the top page