Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 3/3/2024 8:16:29 PM
Sunday, March 3, 2024
Sunday, March 3, 2024
Senate
Finance Committee
Change made: March 3, 2024 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 5, 2024 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 3, 2024 7:11 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
March 6, 2024 1:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
SB1104
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Health Care Facilities – Notice to Consumers – Out–of–Network Status (Health Care Provider Out–of–Network Information Act)
REMOVED: 7:11 PM

Change made: March 3, 2024 7:13 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 6, 2024 4:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: March 6, 2024 5:00 PM)
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Change made: March 3, 2024 12:33 PM - HEARING ADDED
Finance Committee - Voting Session
March 7, 2024 5:00 PM
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

House
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee
Change made: March 3, 2024 2:56 PM - HEARING ADDED
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
March 4, 2024 7:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page