Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 8/5/2021 8:03:21 PM
Thursday, August 5, 2021
Thursday, August 5, 2021
Other
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study
Change made: August 5, 2021 9:08 AM - HEARING ADDED
Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards, Task Force to Study - Other
August 12, 2021 10:30 AM
Google Meet Video Conference
First Meeting

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Change made: August 5, 2021 4:17 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission - Other
September 8, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
The Young Adult Subsidy Program
The State Reinsurance Program
Updates on Federal Health Insurance Policies

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Change made: August 5, 2021 7:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup - Other
August 17, 2021 4:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page