Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2022 8:55:36 AM
Thursday, January 27, 2022
Thursday, January 27, 2022
House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:40 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Accountability and Implemenation Board
REMOVED: 8:40 AM

Change made: January 27, 2022 8:42 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 9, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
MSDE Accountability and Implemenation Board
ADDED: 8:42 AM

Ways and Means Committee
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:53 AM - HEARING ADDED
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
February 10, 2022 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0314
Del Novotny

County Boards of Education – Voting Members – Requirements
HB0334
Del Impallaria

Harford County Board of Education - Alterations, Vacancy Procedures, and Funding for Independent Positions
HB0336
Del Impallaria

Harford County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
HB0347
Del Boteler, et al

Baltimore County - County Superintendent - Election and Recall Procedures and Compensation
HB0352
Del Qi, et al

Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
HB0354
PG Co Deleg

Prince George's County - Nonschool Use of Public School Facilities PG 505-22
HB0355
Prince George's County Delegation

Prince George's County - Workgroup on the Membership and Operation of the Prince George's County Board of Education PG 503-22
HB0376
Del Guyton, et al

Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
HB0380
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County Board of Education – Election of Members MC 04–22
HB0383
Dels Korman and Solomon

Young Readers Programs – Establishment (Young Readers Program Expansion Act)

Other
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Change made: January 27, 2022 8:23 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Community Health Resources Commission - Other
February 1, 2022 10:00 AM
Virtual Meeting
Regular Meeting of the Maryland Health Resources Commission

Click to return on the top page