Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Brooks, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Hill, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, McIntosh, Metzgar, Sample-Hughes, Shetty, P. Young, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Carr, Charles, Johnson, Krebs, Rosenberg, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide patients with a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with an interpreter, a translator, or other accommodation to provide assistance to patients; requiring each administrator of a hospital to conspicuously post the patient's bill of rights on the hospital's website and in areas of the hospital accessible to patients and visitors; requiring the Department of Health to submit a certain report by January 1, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0301
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {556389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967673/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {556389/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {967673/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Text - Chapter - Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page