Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Acevero, B. Barnes, Barron, Chang, Jackson, Korman, Krimm, Lierman, Reznik, Solomon, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each institution of higher education to develop and adopt a policy on student concerns about athletic programs and activities that meets certain requirements on or before October 1, 2019; requiring each institution of higher education to post the policy and any changes to the policy on the institution's website and to submit the policy to the Maryland Higher Education Commission and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0798
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
(   11-1601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page