Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Eligible Investments
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Cassilly, Chang, Hornberger, Metzgar, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of investment for the cybersecurity investment incentive tax credit to include convertible debt; defining a specified term; and providing that the Act shall apply to investments made in qualified Maryland cybersecurity companies after June 30, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0351
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page