Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Buckel, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Grammer, Jackson, Kerr, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Metzgar, Qi, Shoemaker, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying a certain time frame within which a certain franchisor is required to notify a franchisee of an intention to terminate or refuse to renew a beer franchise agreement; exempting certain franchisors from a prohibition against terminating or refusing to continue to renew a beer franchise agreement without good cause under certain circumstances; providing for the submission of a certain matter to arbitration and for its application and enforcement in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813395/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {363323/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {813395/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {363323/1 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Franchise Agreements - Notice of Nonrenewal or Termination
(   5-101, 5-107, 5-108, 5-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page