Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Atterbeary, W. Fisher, Lopez, Shetty, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a physician, qualified health care provider, and hospital from including a narrative describing the alleged offense or a photograph of the victim in any request to obtain payment for certain services related to sexual assault forensic examinations for certain sexually related crimes under certain circumstances; altering the services for which the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board is required to pay certain claims and for which a physician and a qualified health care provider are immune from civil liability; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0933
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {786989/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {786989/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Kits - Privacy and Reimbursement
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page