Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Senators King, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Peters, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $4,500,000 in calendar year 2016 to $6,500,000 in calendar year 2017 and each calendar year thereafter, the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Commerce may approve in the specified calendar years; and applying the Act to all research and development tax credits certified after December 15, 2016.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0240
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0211 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {655364/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-27)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {655364/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (113-27) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 743
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page