Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a nongovernmental corporate party to file, at a first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, one copy of a certain disclosure statement; specifying the contents of the disclosure statement; and requiring a nongovernmental corporate party to file a supplemental statement if any required information changes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {298879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {298879/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Judiciary 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Text - Chapter - Courts – Nongovernmental Corporate Parties – Disclosure Statements
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page