Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Zucker, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Waugh, Young, Zirkin, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that the Governor's proposed budget for specified fiscal years include specified rate increases for specified community providers over the funding provided in specified legislative appropriations; requiring the Behavioral Health Administration and the Medical Care Programs Administration jointly to conduct a specified study and implement a specified payment system; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, on or before December 1, 2019, to submit an annual report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0580
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0497 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {843621/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {943123/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {437871/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {843621/2 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Floor Amendment {943123/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16-201.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page