HB0015
|
Police Discipline - Order to Show Cause |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0031
|
Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
|
HB0048
|
Courts - Justices and Judges - Selection and Retention |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
|
- Judiciary
-
Ways and Means
|
|
HB0100
|
Inheritance Tax - Beneficiaries of Limited Means - Installment Payments |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
HB0132
|
Sports Wagering Campaign Contributions Parity Act of 2024 |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0158 (SB0031)
|
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Judiciary
|
|
HB0162 (SB0452)
|
Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0188
|
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0324 (SB0075)
|
Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0325 (SB0164)
|
Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0326 (SB0080)
|
Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0498 (SB0147)
|
Real Property - Access to Counsel in Evictions Program - Mandated Reports |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0677 (SB0023)
|
Orphans' Court Judges - Elections |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
|
- Judiciary
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Ways and Means
|
|
HB0706
|
Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0748
|
State Government – Commission on Hate Crime Response and Prevention – Code of Conduct |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1041
|
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Religion and Disability |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1100 (SB1110)
|
Health - Child Advocacy Centers - Reporting Requirements and Investigations |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/13/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Judiciary
|
|
HB1209
|
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - Penalties |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1470 (SB0449)
|
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
HB0125 (SB0159)
|
Courts – Military Records – Recordation and Inspection |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
1/24/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0321 (SB0435)
|
Criminal Law - Crimes of Malicious or Fraudulent Burning - Prohibitions and Penalties |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0330 (SB0568)
|
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
|
HB0338 (SB0182)
|
Criminal Procedure – Facial Recognition Technology – Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0357 (SB0193)
|
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
|
|
HB0404 (SB0190)
|
Public Safety - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0458 (SB0111)
|
Criminal Procedure - Protection of Identity of Minor Victim |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0476 (SB0549)
|
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis and Search - Applicability for Deceased and Missing Individuals |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0508 (SB0550)
|
Children - Labor Trafficking |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0542 (SB0668)
|
Department of Human Services - Children in Foster Care - Luggage |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0664 (SB0575)
|
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
- Judiciary
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0667 (SB0017)
|
Criminal Law - Crimes Relating to Animals - Conviction and Sentencing |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0763
|
Commission on Hate Crime Response and Prevention - Membership and Sunset |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0861
|
Procurement - Preferences - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprise Program |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Health and Government Operations
|
|
HB0892
|
Criminal Law - Benefits Exploitation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1154 (SB0755)
|
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Office of Domestic Terrorism Response |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Appropriations
|
|
HB1316
|
Real Property – Holding Over – Expedited Hearing and Service of Summons for Active Duty Service Member |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1397 (SB0590)
|
Human Relations - Discrimination - Protected Characteristics |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
|
- Economic Matters
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
- Finance
|
HJ0001 (SJ0001)
|
Affirming the Federal Equal Rights Amendment |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|