HB0754
|
Vehicle Excise Tax - Trade-In Allowance - Repeal |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0765
|
Property Tax - Credit for Hotel or Residential Development Projects |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Ways and Means
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
HB0970
|
Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1135
|
Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024 |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Economic Matters
|
|
HB1254
|
Child Care Providers - Criminal History Records Checks and Abuse and Neglect Clearances - Requirements |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1274
|
Landlord and Tenant – Failure to Pay Rent – Evidence of Notice to Tenant |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1276 (SB1138)
|
Public Works Contracts – Apprenticeship Requirements (Maryland Workforce Apprenticeship Utilization Act) |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Economic Matters
|
|
HB1490 (SB0765)
|
Economic Development - Business Diversity Incubator Program and Fund - Established |
Primary
|
1 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
3/13/2024 - 2:00 PM
|
|
HB0287 (SB0342)
|
Property Tax - Renters' Property Tax Relief Program - Assets Calculation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB0301
|
Correctional Services - Diminution of a Term of Confinement - First-Degree Rape and First-Degree Sexual Offense (Pava Marie LaPere Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0331
|
Election Law - Candidate Expenditures - Campaign-Related Caregiving Expenses |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0334 (SB0376)
|
Higher Education - MPowering Joint Steering Council - Funding |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Appropriations
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0357 (SB0193)
|
Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m.
|
- Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
|
|
HB0385 (SB0038)
|
Wage Payment and Collection - Pay Stubs and Pay Statements - Required Information |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Economic Matters
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB0432
|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0467
|
Food Service Facilities and Tipped Workers - Service Fees and Tip Credits (One Fair Wage Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Economic Matters
|
|
HB0472 (SB0540)
|
Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0496 (SB0758)
|
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Definition of Consent and Repeal of Force |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0522 (SB0492)
|
Public Schools - Student Telehealth Appointments - State Guidelines, Policies, and Access |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB0523
|
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Good Cause |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0558
|
Primary and Secondary Education - Comprehensive Health Education Framework - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0598 (SB0413)
|
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
|
HB0696 (SB0579)
|
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Universal Expansion Report |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
|
- Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Rules
|
HB0718
|
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - Seniors - Minimum Benefit |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
|
- Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
|
|
HB0724 (SB0123)
|
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Reduce Sentence |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0789 (SB0545)
|
Primary and Secondary Education - Public School Employees - Salaries |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0837 (SB0033)
|
More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
|
- Ways and Means
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Rules
|
HB0890
|
Public Schools - Discipline-Related Data - Collection and Publication |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB0892
|
Criminal Law - Benefits Exploitation |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB0903 (SB0797)
|
Education - Access to Attorneys, Advocates, and Consultants for Special Education Program and Fund - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
- Budget and Taxation
|
HB1007 (SB0766)
|
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1051 (SB1059)
|
Maternal Health – Assessments, Referrals, and Reporting (Maryland Maternal Health Act of 2024) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Health and Government Operations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Finance
|
HB1167 (SB1090)
|
Maryland Center for School Safety - Secure Schools Emergency Response Grant Program - Established |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Ways and Means
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Appropriations
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1219 (SB1024)
|
Public and Nonpublic Middle and High Schools - Venue-Specific Emergency Action Plans for Athletic Facilities (The Bailey Bullock Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Returned Passed
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
HB1237
|
State Department of Education - Task Force to Study the Maryland Online Special Education System |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Ways and Means
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1386
|
Education - School Employee Antibias Training - Requirements |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
HB1429 (SB0662)
|
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Protecting the Admissibility of Creative Expression (PACE Act) |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|
HB1438 (SB0958)
|
Responding to Emergency Needs From Extreme Weather (RENEW) Act of 2024 |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
|
- Economic Matters
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM -
Environment and Transportation
|
|
HB1441
|
Early Childhood Education - Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Programs - Alterations |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Passed Enrolled
|
- Ways and Means
2/26/2024 - 11:00 AM -
Appropriations
|
- Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM - Budget and Taxation
|
HJ0001 (SJ0001)
|
Affirming the Federal Equal Rights Amendment |
Co-Sponsor
|
2 |
2 |
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
|
- Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
|
|