Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Adams, Arikan, Barron, Boyce, Bromwell, Charles, Crosby, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Lafferty, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lisanti, Mautz, Moon, Qi, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Terrasa, and C. Watson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force to investigate and study ways to increase the procurement of locally grown foods in State contracts and to promote participation by Maryland farmers in the process; providing for the composition of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0608
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement - Maryland Food for Maryland Institutions Task Force
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page