Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Davis, Edelson, Embry, Fennell, Grossman, Guzzone, Henson, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Jackson, D. Jones, J. Long, McCaskill, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Qi, Roberson, Rogers, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Taveras, Taylor, Turner, Valderrama, White Holland, Williams, Boyce, Foley, Healey, Lehman, Love, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Historic Property Revitalization Director as a position in the Department of Housing and Community Development; prohibiting a local legislative body from prohibiting the placement of certain manufactured homes or modular dwellings in a zoning district that allows single-family residential uses under certain circumstances; requiring local jurisdictions to allow an increase in density of certain qualified projects in certain districts or zones for certain properties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {933128/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-97)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {133429/1 (Delegate Schmidt) Rejected (37-96)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {173626/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-36)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113027/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-38)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203024/1 Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Floor Amendment {933128/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (36-97) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Floor Amendment {133429/1 (Delegate Schmidt) Rejected (37-96) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Floor Amendment {173626/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (38-94) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
House 3/28/2024 3/15/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-36) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113027/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable with Amendments {113027/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Floor Amendment {183820/1 (Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-38) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
(   10-103,   1-401,   4-104,   7-501 through 7-509 )
Last Updated: 4/24/2024 12:38 PM
Click to return on the top page