Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for submission of certain photographs by certain applicants for a for-hire driver's license to the Public Service Commission; requiring certain applicants for a for-hire driver's license to allow the Commission access to photographs through the Motor Vehicle Administration; requiring certain applicants to provide photographs in a format that the Commission specifies; repealing the requirement for certain applicants for a Baltimore City taxicab license to have completed a certain course; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text - Chapter - For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page