Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Ali, Barkley, Barve, Clippinger, Ebersole, Gibson, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Jalisi, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Pendergrass, Stein, Turner, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority to engage an outside consultant to conduct a market-specific study to make certain determinations related to a State student loan refinancing program in Maryland; requiring the consultant to report to the Authority and requiring the report to include certain elements; requiring the Authority to review the consultant's report and make certain comments or recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-14)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {417573/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-8)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (123-14) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Reassigned to Finance 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Committee Amendment {417573/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (129-8) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text - Chapter - State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page