Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Effective Professional Development Programs in Local Health Departments
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Carr, Ebersole, Feldmark, Ivey, Lehman, J. Lewis, Lopez, Luedtke, Moon, Shetty, Turner, Valentino-Smith, C. Watson, R. Watson, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a workgroup to develop certain professional development programs for certain staff in local health departments; providing for the composition of the workgroup; requiring the workgroup to solicit certain feedback, develop certain programs, and identify certain individuals; requiring the workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Workgroup on Effective Professional Development Programs in Local Health Departments
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page