Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Barkley, Brooks, Hettleman, Jameson, Stein, Valderrama, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured who becomes a surviving spouse based solely on the insured's change in marital status.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1028 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843390/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {843390/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Referred Finance 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page