Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, Hershey, Jackson, King, Rosapepe, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to waive certain civil penalties assessed for certain toll violations under certain circumstances; and requiring the Authority to reimburse certain civil penalties paid in error and notify certain individuals eligible for a certain reimbursement.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743422/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {453428/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {573822/1 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {363128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743422/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {743422/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Floor Amendment {453428/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Floor Amendment {573822/1 (Senator King) Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2022 2/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transportation Authority - Public-Private Partnerships and Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {363128/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text - Chapter - Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:46 PM
Click to return on the top page