Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Cain, Carey, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Guyton, Hettleman, Ivey, Kerr, Korman, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Smith, Solomon, Terrasa, Turner, C. Watson, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add a certified teacher who is actively teaching and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a teacher member with the advice and consent of the Senate who received the highest number of votes after an election by teachers in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain parent member with the advice and consent of the Senate from a certain list submitted by the Maryland PTA; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0529
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0154 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {245161/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {933823/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (41-95)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {273728/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-97)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444133/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-37)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {245161/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/13 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Floor Amendment {933823/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (41-95) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Floor Amendment {273728/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-97) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {444133/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (98-37) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 576
Text - Chapter - State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
(   2-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page