Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Acevero, Bartlett, Boyce, Crutchfield, Gaines, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Johnson, Jones, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pendergrass, Shetty, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valderrama, and P. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to provide ridership services on transit vehicles to any permanent employee in any unit of the Executive Branch of State government, including a unit with an independent personnel system; prohibiting the Administration from collecting fees or reimbursement for certain transit services; and requiring the Maryland Department of Transportation and the Department of Budget and Management to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on the cost and feasibility of expanding the program.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0319
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-21)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827178/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-16)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - State Employees Subject to Collective Bargaining - Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {594964/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (117-21) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {827178/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-16) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page