Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Ali, Anderson, Angel, D. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Carozza, Clark, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Cullison, Davis, Fennell, Folden, Gibson, Glass, Glenn, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Kelly, Kittleman, Knotts, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, A. Miller, W. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Otto, Parrott, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sanchez, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, A. Washington, West, Wilkins, Wilson, P. Young, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Beitzel, Buckel, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Fisher, Flanagan, Ghrist, Grammer, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Malone, Mautz, McDonough, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Reilly, Rey, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, in a prosecution for certain sexual offenses, evidence that the defendant committed sexually assaultive behavior before or after the offense for which the defendant is on trial may be admissible for certain reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce evidence of sexually assaultive behavior at least 90 days before the trial or at a later time under certain circumstances; requiring the State to provide a copy of a certain motion to the defendant; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0270
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {172019/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {172019/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text - Chapter - Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page