Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision that prohibits the Governor from appointing a member of the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, a member of the Board of Directors of the Medical System Corporation, or an officer or a full-time employee of the Medical System Corporation or the University of Maryland, Baltimore Campus to the Emergency Medical Services Board; and prohibiting the Governor from appointing more than two persons from certain health entities under the same governing board to the Emergency Medical Services Board.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0175
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116686/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {637775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {116686/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Finance 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {637775/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
(   13-503, 13-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page