Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
Sponsored by
Chair, Economic Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Maryland Insurance Administration)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to send certain notices of the expiration date of certain policies to commercial policyholders at least 45 days before the expiration date; and requiring the Fund to provide certain fund producers with a certain rewritten policy quote under certain circumstances within 7 days after receiving certain information.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text - Chapter - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
(   20-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page