Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Anderson, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barve, Carey, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Kelly, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Platt, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a contractor or subcontractor awarded a specified contract for a specified construction project that receives specified funding from the State capital budget to be affiliated with, and to use apprentices from, an apprenticeship program that is registered with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation or the United States Department of Labor, or requiring the contractor or subcontractor to make specified payments to the State Apprenticeship Training Fund or to specified apprenticeship programs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0699
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0108 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {923597/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {273527/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (46-86)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-47)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
House 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {923597/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Delegate Parrott) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Floor Amendment {273527/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (46-86) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-47) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782
Text - Chapter - Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
(   17-602, 17-6A-01 through 17-6A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page