Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Acevero, Arikan, B. Barnes, Cullison, Hornberger, Kittleman, Korman, Krebs, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Moon, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Wilkins, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "cottage food product" to include nonhazardous food, as specified in regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health, that is sold in the State in accordance with certain laws and regulations to retail food stores or food cooperatives; requiring a certain label for a cottage food product for sale at a retail food store; requiring the owner of a cottage food business to complete a food safety course approved by the Department and submit the label that will be affixed to the product; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0290
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Cottage Food Products - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {366980/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Cottage Food Products - Definition
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {366980/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
House 3/18/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
(   21-301, 21-330.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page