Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Pena-Melnyk, Anderton, Frush, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hixson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Krebs, Lierman, Lisanti, McComas, McCray, McMillan, Metzgar, Rose, Turner, Vogt, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to make available the investigational drug, biological product, or device to eligible patients; requiring a manufacturer of an investigational drug, biological product, or device to notify a specified patient and a specified health care provider of specified side effects or risks; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to develop an informed consent form that meets specified requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0572
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {146788/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967271/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {146788/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {967271/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Text - Chapter - Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
(   21-2B-01 through 21-2B-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page