Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Bartlett, Cain, Carey, Chang, Charkoudian, Crosby, D.E. Davis, Feldmark, Fennell, Glenn, Lisanti, C. Watson, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding bladder, kidney, or renal cell cancer to the types of cancer that are considered occupational diseases suffered in the line of duty and are compensable in a certain manner.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-13)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-13) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page