Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Public Senior Higher Education Institution - Payment of County Minimum Wage
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Anderson, Angel, D. Barnes, Barron, Carr, Cullison, Frush, Gutierrez, Healey, C. Howard, Kelly, Korman, McCray, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Queen, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified provision of the Maryland Wage and Hour Law to authorize a specified public senior higher education institution to pay to a specified employee under specified circumstances the minimum wage rate set by the county in which the employee's principal place of employment is located.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Public Senior Higher Education Institution - Payment of County Minimum Wage
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   10-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page