Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Queen, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, Barron, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gibson, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to have a policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses certain matters including access to child placement resources; requiring the managing official of each facility to provide the written policy to an inmate at the time of a positive pregnancy test; requiring the Maryland Commission on Correctional Standards to routinely review each facility's policy; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0629
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {882416/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-29)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {882416/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (107-29) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827
Text - Chapter - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page