Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Assessments of Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Barron, Branch, Brooks, Conaway, Davis, Fennell, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, McCray, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Turner, A. Washington, M. Washington, C. Wilson, and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop standards for the periodic psychological assessment of all law enforcement officers, if determined by the Commission to be appropriate.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {342117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-29)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Evaluations of Law Enforcement Officers
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {342117/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Psychological Assessments of Law Enforcement Officers
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-29) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page