Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, P. Young, Pendergrass, Cullison, Hill, Kipke, and Miele
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from a 6-month to a 12-month period, the length for which a certain insurer, nonprofit health service plan, and health maintenance organization is required to provide coverage for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives; providing that a certain provision of the Act may not be construed to require a provider to prescribe, furnish, or dispense contraceptives for 12 months at one time; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416482/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {416482/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
(   15-826.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page