Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Glenn, Anderson, Barnes, Beidle, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clagett, Cullison, DeBoy, Donoghue, Frush, Gilchrist, Glass, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Harper, Haynes, Howard, Hubbard, Hucker, Ivey, Kach, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, McConkey, McIntosh, McMillan, A. Miller, Mitchell, Mizeur, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Simmons, Smigiel, Stein, Stukes, Summers, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Vaughn, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the scope of authority and the duties of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission relating to the treatment of patients qualified to use medical marijuana; authorizing the Commission to set fees; providing that the fees are part of a specified fund; encouraging the Commission to approve specified applications; authorizing the Commission to approve specified applications; requiring the Commission to make an annual report regarding specified medical marijuana treatment centers; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
(   13-3301 through 13-3304, 13-3305, 13-3306 through 13-3311, 13-3307, 13-3310, 13-3311, 13-3312, 13-3313, 13-3314, 13-3315, 13-3316, 13-3317, 13-3318, 13-3319, 13-3320, 13-3321, 13-3325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page