Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Adams, Afzali, Ali, Anderson, Anderton, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Beitzel, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Clark, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Cullison, Davis, Ebersole, Folden, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Ghrist, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Hornberger, C. Howard, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jacobs, Jameson, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, A. Miller, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Mosby, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Reilly, Rey, Robinson, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vogt, M. Washington, West, Wilson, Wivell, K. Young, P. Young, and Rosenberg
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to include in an order appointing a guardian of the person of a disabled person the duty to foster and preserve certain family relationships under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person – Petition for Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356783/3 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Duties of a Guardian of the Person – Petition for Visitation
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {356783/3 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Petition for Visitation
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {548272/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text - Chapter - Duties of a Guardian of the Person - Visitation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page