Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Beidle, Feldman, Griffith, Hayes, Hettleman, Kelley, Lam, Patterson, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Augustine, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hester, Jackson, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lee, McCray, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, West, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2023 through 2032, to include in the annual State operating budget $577,000,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0001
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1043 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 6 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {519531/1 Adopted
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
7 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
9 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814960/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {519531/1 Adopted 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 7 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 8 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Referred Appropriations 9 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {814960/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (122-17) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
Post Passage 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text - Chapter - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding
(   10-214, 11-206.3, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:47 PM
Click to return on the top page