Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake Identification
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Astle, Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Eckardt, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, King, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Ready, Rosapepe, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a video lottery operation licensee to confiscate the identification proffered by an individual to gain admittance to a video lottery facility if the licensee determines that the identification is fictitious or fraudulently altered; providing a specified immunity from liability for a licensee under specified circumstances; and requiring a licensee to return a specified identification to a specified organization within a specified period.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0265 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake Identification
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page