Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years Old
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Astle, Benson, Cassilly, Currie, DeGrange, Edwards, Feldman, Guzzone, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Waugh, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the State income tax for specified military retirement income for individuals who are at least 65 years old from $10,000 to $15,000; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0738
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page