Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hester, Kagan, Lam, Lee, McCray, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying that the purpose of the Fund is to provide funds for reasonable costs and attorney's fees for students provided counsel under certain provisions of law; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Fund; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0633
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344561/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {584966/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (116-13)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-3)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {344561/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {584966/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (116-13) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-3) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
(   11-602 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page