Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, McCray, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is aggrieved by an act that would constitute a violation of certain hate crime laws, or the Attorney General on behalf of the person, may bring a civil action against a certain person; authorizing the court to impose an injunction and award certain damages; providing that damages awarded by the court may be equal to three times the amount of actual damages; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1119 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Hate Crimes - Civil Remedy
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   10-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page