Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Sydnor, Augustine, Hettleman, Carter, Waldstreicher, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a court from imposing a sentence of life imprisonment without the possibility of parole on an individual who was under the age of 18 years at the time the offense was committed.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0196 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
(   1-402 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page