Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Beidle, Augustine, King, Waldstreicher, and Benson
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before June 1, 2021, the Maryland Department of Health, in collaboration with local health departments of the State, to adopt and implement a certain plan to respond to the outbreak of COVID-19; requiring, for calendar year 2021, certain institutions of higher education in the State to establish a certain COVID-19 security plan; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain COVID-19 tests and related items and services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0836
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787672/1
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787672/1
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {516287/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {173527/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (41-92)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (38-94)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-30)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {787672/1 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {787672/1 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Reilly) Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations Appropriations 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {516287/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Floor Amendment {173527/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (41-92) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Floor Amendment {693325/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (38-94) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (104-30) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
(   11-1701, 11-1702 )
(   16-201.5, 18-9A-01 through 18-9A-04, 19-14C-01, 19-14C-02, 19-1814, 19-411 )
(   15-856 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page