Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Feldman, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Hettleman, Kagan, King, Kramer, Lam, Pinsky, Washington, Young, McCray, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Zucker, Jackson, and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for certain community college employees; establishing procedures for the selection and certification of an exclusive bargaining representative; establishing a cap of four on the number of bargaining units in each community college; requiring certain contracts and agreements entered into before September 1, 2022, to remain in effect until the agreement or contract expires; requiring the Governor to include certain amounts in the annual budget bill for Baltimore City Community College; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0894
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): September 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737975/1
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737975/1
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-15)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {737975/1 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {737975/1 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-15) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-403,   16-412,   16-414.1,   16-701 through 16-715 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page