Day(s)
As of: 5/11/2025 10:37:41 AM
Created: 1/11/2023 12:26 PM
9:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
These bills are being heard by the Pensions Subcommittee.
Created: 1/10/2023 5:00 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
All bills are Sponsor-only testimony.
Sen Kagan
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Sen Jackson
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sen Jackson
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services
Sen Hester
Interagency Commission on School Construction - Systemic Renovation Projects - Eligibility
Created: 1/12/2023 3:38 PM
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen West
Recordation Tax – Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust – Extent of Exemption
Sen Elfreth
State Personnel – Executive Branch Service Contracts – Policy, Certification, and Notification
Sen McCray
Department of Transportation – Consolidated Transportation Program and Debt Limit of Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds (State and Federal Transportation Funding Act)
Sen Ellis
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Charles County Sports and Wellness Center
Sen Benson
Property Tax – Municipal Corporation Business Personal Property Tax Rate – Alterations
Created: 1/11/2023 12:26 PM
9:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill Hearings
Created: 1/10/2023 2:49 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Education: Curriculum Development, State Superintendent of Schools
(Added - 1/17/2023 10:33 AM)
Briefing on Education: Curriculum Development, State Superintendent of Schools, and AIB
(Removed - 1/17/2023 10:33 AM)
Created: 1/10/2023 2:14 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Insurance 101 (A briefing from the Maryland Insurance Administration) and Introductory Briefing from the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
(Added - 1/11/2023 12:38 PM)
Insurance 101 and Introduction to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
(Removed - 1/11/2023 12:38 PM)
Created: 1/13/2023 1:54 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
12:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
OIS Training on the Senate Floor System
Created: 1/6/2023 11:26 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/5/2023 10:56 AM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on 529 Calculations
(Added - 1/11/2023 12:15 PM)
Briefing by the Comptroller
(Added - 1/11/2023 12:15 PM)
Created: 1/11/2023 4:23 PM
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Regulating State and Local Alcoholic Beverages
Licensing Tobacco
Created: 1/10/2023 3:34 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Overview of Open Meetings Act and Public Information Act; Introduction to the Public Access Ombudsman; and Overview of Discrimination Laws
Created: 1/12/2023 3:59 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Hill
Maryland General and Limited Power of Attorney Act – Assistance With Governmental Benefits and Programs
Created: 1/9/2023 1:11 PM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Canceled
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Palakovich Carr, et al
Income Tax - Payments of Fines, Penalties, and Other Amounts - Addition Modification
Harford County Delegation Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Economic Development Committee.
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommedation to the full delegation.
The Bi-County Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
Maryland-National Capital Park Planning Commission
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Washington County House Delegation Meeting
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools