Day(s)
As of: 5/30/2023 5:10:28 PM
Created: 2/5/2021 4:30 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
These bills are being heard before the Pensions Subcommittee
Created: 2/5/2021 4:30 PM
9:00 AM
-
Virtual Meeting
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Bill Hearings
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/12/2021 2:20 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Washington
Minority Business Enterprises – Sexual and Gender Minorities (Imari’s Business Pride Act)
Sen Pinsky
States of Emergency – Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments – Notice and Authorization
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Jennings
Controlled Hazardous Substance Facility Permit - Research Facilities - Chemical Warfare Material Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Jennings and Hester
Procurement - Information Technology - Cloud-Based Virtual Desktop Infrastructure
Created: 3/2/2021 11:51 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The workgroup will start approximately after the conclusion of the bill hearings.
Cybersecurity Workgroup
Sen Zucker
State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Access to New Employees
(Added - 2/11/2021 10:57 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2021 10:57 AM)
(Added - 2/11/2021 10:57 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Finance\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Feldman
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act – Revisions and Public Health Emergency Leave
(Removed - 2/19/2021 4:29 PM)
Sen Feldman
Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program
(Removed - 2/19/2021 4:29 PM)
Sen Peters
Labor and Employment – Workplace Fraud Act – Rebuttable Presumption of the Employer–Employee Relationship
(Removed - 3/1/2021 7:32 AM)
Created: 3/3/2021 7:57 PM
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 2/9/2021 5:11 PM
11:00 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County Senators
Charles County - Community Service and Pretrial Release Programs - Authorization
Created: 2/27/2021 8:47 PM
Tuesday, March 2, 2021
6:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 3/3/2021 9:47 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Created: 2/8/2021 4:11 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Feldmark
Economic Development – Broadband Providers – Joint Trenching and Fee (Building Out Broadband Act of 2021)
(Removed - 2/17/2021 9:51 AM)
Created: 3/3/2021 5:51 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Immediately after Bill Hearings
Created: 2/10/2021 11:07 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Residential Districts and School Zones PG 302–21
(Added - 2/17/2021 9:54 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems PG 305-21
(Added - 2/17/2021 9:54 AM)
(Added - 2/15/2021 5:42 PM)
(Added - 2/15/2021 5:42 PM)
Cecil County Delegation
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Created: 3/2/2021 9:33 AM
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 2/11/2021 3:20 PM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Final bill order below.
Del R. Lewis
Alcohol and Drug Counseling - Alcohol and Drug Trainees - Practice Through Telehealth
Del Beitzel
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program – Prescribers of Opioids – Notification Requirement
Del Parrott
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Del Cullison
Office of Health Care Quality – Influenza Virus Immunization Education and Information – Assisted Living Facilities
Created: 3/1/2021 11:59 AM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Or immediately after the floor session.
- HB 182, 276, 288, 540, 674, 736, 806, 983
Del Atterbeary
Child Custody – Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence – Training for Judges and Child’s Counsel
Del Crutchfield
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Del W. Fisher
Adult Protective Services - Vulnerable Adults Registry - Investigations and Records of Abuse and Neglect and Workgroup Study
Created: 3/3/2021 12:01 PM
12:15 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Hartman
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - COVID-19-Related Distribution of Retirement Income
Del Buckel
Economic Development – Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund – Establishment
Del Buckel
Economic Development – Maryland Innovation Initiative University Expansion Pilot Program – Establishment
Del Luedtke
Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Del Palakovich Carr
Income Tax - Internal Revenue Code Amendments and the Federal CARES Act - Decoupling
Del Palakovich Carr
Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Del Buckel
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
Del D. Barnes
Economic Development – Maryland Technology Development Corporation – Pre–Seed Builder Fund
Del Sample-Hughes
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Created: 3/4/2021 11:03 AM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Workgroup will conside HB 940.
Weekly Harford County House Delegation Meeting
Bill Hearing
(Added - 3/4/2021 10:00 AM)
Bill Hearing